Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/03/1997
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/03/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/03/1997
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/03/1997
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/03/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/03/1997
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/03/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 06/03/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/03/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 06/03/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 06/03/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/05/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/05/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/05/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/05/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/05/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/05/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/05/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/05/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/11/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/17/1997
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 06/17/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/17/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/18/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 06/18/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/19/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/21/1997
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/24/1997
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 06/24/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/24/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 06/26/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/09/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 07/09/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/09/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 07/09/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 07/09/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/09/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/09/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 07/09/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/09/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/10/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/10/1997
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/11/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 07/11/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/11/1997
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/15/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/15/1997
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 07/15/1997
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 07/15/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/15/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/15/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/15/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 07/15/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/15/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/16/1997
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 07/16/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 07/16/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/16/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 07/16/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/16/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/17/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/17/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/17/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/22/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/22/1997
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/22/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/22/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/22/1997
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/22/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 07/22/1997
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/24/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/24/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/24/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/24/1997
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 07/25/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/25/1997
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/25/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 07/25/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 07/28/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/28/1997
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 07/28/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 07/28/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/29/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/29/1997
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 07/29/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 07/31/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/31/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/31/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/31/1997
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/31/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/31/1997
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/31/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/03/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 09/03/1997
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/03/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/03/1997
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/03/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/03/1997
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/03/1997
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 09/03/1997
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/03/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 09/03/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/03/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/03/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/03/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 09/03/1997
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 09/03/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/03/1997
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/03/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/03/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/05/1997
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 09/05/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/09/1997
Rep. Johnson, Jay W. [D-WI-8] 09/09/1997
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 09/09/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/10/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/23/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/23/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/24/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/25/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/25/1997
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/25/1997
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 09/25/1997
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 09/25/1997
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/25/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 09/30/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 10/07/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/07/1997
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 10/07/1997
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 10/08/1997
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 10/09/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 10/21/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 10/21/1997
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/21/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/21/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/21/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 10/21/1997
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 10/24/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 10/24/1997
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 11/05/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 11/12/1997