Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 05/15/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 05/22/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 06/03/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/03/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/03/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/03/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 06/05/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 06/05/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 06/05/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 06/11/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/11/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/11/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/17/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 06/17/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 06/17/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 06/17/1997
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/26/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/09/1997
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/09/1997
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 07/09/1997
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 07/09/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 07/10/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/10/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 07/10/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/15/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 07/15/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/16/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/17/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/22/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 07/22/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/24/1997
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 07/28/1997
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 07/29/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 07/29/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/31/1997
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 07/31/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/03/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/03/1997
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 09/03/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 09/03/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/03/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 09/03/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 09/03/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 09/03/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/03/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/03/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 09/03/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 09/03/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/03/1997
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/05/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/05/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 09/09/1997
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/09/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 09/09/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 09/16/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/29/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 10/07/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 10/07/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/07/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 10/07/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 10/08/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/08/1997
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 10/08/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 10/08/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 10/21/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 10/21/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/21/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 10/21/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/21/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 10/30/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 01/27/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 01/27/1998
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 07/21/1998