Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 06/04/1997
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/04/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 06/04/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/04/1997
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 06/04/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/04/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/04/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/04/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/04/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 06/04/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/04/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/04/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 06/04/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/04/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/04/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/04/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 06/04/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 06/18/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 06/18/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/18/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/18/1997
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 06/18/1997
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/18/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 06/18/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/18/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/18/1997
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/18/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/18/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/18/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 06/18/1997
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/18/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/18/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/18/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/18/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/26/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/26/1997
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 06/26/1997
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/26/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/26/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/26/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/26/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/26/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/26/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/26/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/26/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 06/26/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 07/22/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/22/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 07/22/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 07/22/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/22/1997
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/22/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 07/22/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/22/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/22/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 07/22/1997
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 07/22/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 07/22/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/22/1997
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 07/22/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/22/1997