Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/16/1997
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/16/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/16/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 05/16/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/16/1997
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 05/16/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/16/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 05/16/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 05/16/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/16/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 05/16/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/06/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 06/06/1997
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/06/1997
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/06/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/06/1997
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/06/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/06/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/06/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/06/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/06/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 06/06/1997
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/06/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/06/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/06/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/06/1997
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/06/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/06/1997
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/06/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/06/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/06/1997
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 06/06/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/06/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/06/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/06/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/06/1997
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/06/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/06/1997
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/06/1997
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 06/06/1997
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/06/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 06/06/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/06/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/17/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/17/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/17/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 07/17/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/17/1997
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 07/17/1997
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 07/17/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 07/17/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/25/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 07/31/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/31/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 03/10/1998