Refine your search

Refined by:

Ohio Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/09/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 02/04/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/04/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/11/1997
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 02/25/1997

Show cosponsors who withdrew