Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/13/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 02/04/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/04/1998
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 02/04/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 02/04/1998
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 02/04/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 02/04/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/04/1998
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 02/04/1998
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/04/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/04/1998
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 02/04/1998
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/04/1998
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 02/04/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/04/1998
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 02/04/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 02/04/1998
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 02/04/1998
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 02/04/1998
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/04/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 02/04/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/04/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/04/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/04/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/04/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 02/04/1998
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/04/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 02/04/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/04/1998
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/04/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 02/04/1998
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 02/04/1998
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 02/04/1998
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 02/04/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 02/04/1998
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 02/04/1998
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 02/04/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 02/24/1998
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 02/24/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 02/24/1998
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/24/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/24/1998
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/24/1998
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 02/24/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/24/1998
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 02/24/1998
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 02/24/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/24/1998
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/24/1998
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/10/1998
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 03/10/1998
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/10/1998
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 03/10/1998
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/10/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 05/20/1998
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/20/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/20/1998