Refine your search

Showing 6 of 6 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
05/11/1998 Became Public Law No: 105-175.
05/11/1998 Signed by President.
05/01/1998 Presented to President.
04/29/1998 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
04/28/1998 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 402 - 0 (Roll No. 112).
11/07/1997 Introduced in House