There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Popular Titles

Vietnam Trade Waiver Disapproval resolution (Identified by CRS)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Disapproving the extension of the waiver authority contained in section 402(c) of the Trade Act of 1974 with respect to Vietnam.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/30/1998Failed of passage/not agreed to in House: On passage Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 163 - 260 (Roll No. 356).
07/29/1998Reported adversely by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 105-653.
06/04/1998Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date
07/30/1998-4:09pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/30/1998-4:09pmOn passage Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 163 - 260 (Roll No. 356).
Action By: House of Representatives
07/30/1998-3:45pmThe previous question was ordered pursuant to a previous order of the House.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/30/1998-2:31pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/30/1998-2:30pmConsidered by previous order of the House. (consideration: CR H6766-6781)
Action By: House of Representatives
07/30/1998-2:29pmConsideration initiated by previous order of the House.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/29/1998Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 367.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/29/1998Reported adversely by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 105-653.
07/29/1998-1:17pmMr. Solomon asked unanimous consent That it be in order at any time on the legislative day of Thursday, July 30, 1998, to consider in the House the joint resolution, H.J. Res.120, disapproving the extension of the waiver authority contained in section 402(c) of the Trade Act of 1974 with respect to Vietnam; that the joint resolution be considered as read for amendment; that all points of order against the joint resolution and against its consideration be waived; and that the joint resolution be debatable for one hour equally divided and controlled. Agreed to without objection.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/25/1998Ordered to be Reported Adversely by Voice Vote.
06/25/1998Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/23/1998Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee Adversely by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade
06/23/1998Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade
06/10/1998Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
06/05/1998Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1050)
Action By: House of Representatives
06/04/1998Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/04/1998Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 06/04/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/04/1998

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means06/04/1998 Referred to
06/25/1998 Markup by
07/29/1998 Reported by H. Rept. 105-653
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade06/10/1998 Referred to
06/23/1998 Markup by
06/23/1998 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (13)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.J.Res.120. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/04/1998)

Disapproves the recommendation of the President to extend the authority to waive freedom of emigration requirements with respect to Vietnam in order to qualify its products for nondiscriminatory treatment (most-favored-nation treatment).