Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 06/17/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 06/18/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/18/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 06/18/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/18/1998
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/18/1998
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 06/19/1998
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/19/1998
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 06/19/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/19/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 06/19/1998
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/19/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/22/1998
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 06/22/1998
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/22/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/22/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/22/1998
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 06/24/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/24/1998
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 06/24/1998
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/24/1998
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/24/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/24/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/24/1998
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/24/1998
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/24/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 06/25/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/25/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/25/1998
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 06/25/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 07/14/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/14/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 07/14/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/14/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 07/14/1998
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/14/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/14/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 07/14/1998
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 07/14/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/14/1998
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 07/14/1998
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 07/14/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 07/14/1998
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/14/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/14/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/14/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/14/1998
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 07/14/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/14/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/16/1998
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/16/1998
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 07/16/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 07/16/1998
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 07/23/1998
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 07/27/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 07/27/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/31/1998
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 08/06/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 09/09/1998
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/09/1998
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 09/09/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 09/09/1998
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/09/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 09/28/1998