Text: H.J.Res.132 — 105th Congress (1997-1998)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

  • TXT
  • PDF (PDF provides a complete and accurate display of this text.) Tip?

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/08/1998)

 
[Congressional Bills 105th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H.J. Res. 132 Introduced in House (IH)]







105th CONGRESS
  2d Session
H. J. RES. 132

Commending the veterans of service in the Army who fought in the Battle 
       of the Bulge during World War II, and for other purposes.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                            October 8, 1998

  Mr. Smith of New Jersey introduced the following joint resolution; 
        which was referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs

_______________________________________________________________________

                            JOINT RESOLUTION


 
Commending the veterans of service in the Army who fought in the Battle 
       of the Bulge during World War II, and for other purposes.

Whereas the battle in the European theater of operations during World War II 
        known as the Battle of the Bulge took place from December 16, 1944 to 
        January 25, 1945;
Whereas the Battle of the Bulge began on December 16, 1944, with a major German 
        counteroffensive which took Allied forces by surprise and was intended 
        to split the Allied forces in Europe by breaking through the Allied 
        lines, crippling the Allied fuel supply lines, and exacerbate tensions 
        within the Allied alliance;
Whereas 600,000 American troops participated in the Battle of the Bulge, 
        overcoming numerous disadvantages in the early days of the battle that 
        included fewer numbers, treacherous terrain, and bitter weather 
        conditions;
Whereas the Battle of the Bulge resulted in 81,000 American casualties, of whom 
        19,000 were killed, 33,400 were wounded, and 2,000 were either captured 
        or listed as missing in action;
Whereas the worst atrocity involving Americans in the European theater during 
        World War II, known as the Malmedy Massacre, occurred when 86 unarmed 
        American prisoners were gunned down by the German 1st SS Panzer Division 
        on December 17, 1944;
Whereas American forces overcame great odds throughout the battle, including 
        most famously the action of the 101st Airborne Division in holding back 
        German forces at the Belgian town of Bastogne, thereby preventing German 
        forces from achieving their main objective of reaching Antwerp as well 
        as the Meuse River line; and
Whereas the American forces success in defeating the German attack resulted in 
        the defeat of Nazi Germany four months later in April 1945: Now, 
        therefore, be it
    Resolved by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United 
States of America in Congress assembled, That Congress--
            (1) commends the veterans of service in the Army who fought 
        in the Battle of the Bulge during World War II;
            (2) honors those who gave their lives during that battle; 
        and
            (3) authorizes the President to issue a proclamation 
        calling upon the people of the United States to honor the 
        veterans of the Battle of the Bulge with appropriate programs, 
        ceremonies, and activities.
                                 <all>

Share This