There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Appointing the day for the convening of the first session of the One Hundred Sixth Congress.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
11/03/1998Became Public Law No: 105-350. (TXT | PDF)
11/03/1998Signed by President.
10/26/1998Presented to President.
10/21/1998Passed/agreed to in Senate: Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S12810)
10/20/1998Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
10/20/1998Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber
11/03/1998Became Public Law No: 105-350. (TXT | PDF)
11/03/1998Signed by President.
10/26/1998HousePresented to President.
10/21/1998SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/21/1998SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S12810)
10/20/1998-4:36pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/20/1998-4:36pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection.
10/20/1998-4:35pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H11582)
10/20/1998-4:34pmHouseMr. Solomon asked unanimous consent to consider as introduced.
10/20/1998HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (0)

As of 06/19/2019 text has not been received for H.J.Res.138 - Appointing the day for the convening of the first session of the One Hundred Sixth Congress.

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


No related bill information was received for H.J.Res.138.


Subjects (2)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.J.Res.138. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/20/1998)

Provides for convening the first session of the 106th Congress at noon on January 6, 1999.