Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 01/09/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/05/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/05/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 02/10/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/11/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/12/1997