Refine your search

5 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
09/01/1998 By Senator Hatch from Committee on Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 105-298. Minority views filed.
06/24/1998 Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Hatch without amendment. Without written report.
06/12/1997 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 310 - 114 (Roll no. 202).
06/05/1997 Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 105-121.
02/13/1997 Introduced in House