Committees: H.J.Res.54 — 105th Congress (1997-1998)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/13/1997 Referred to
05/14/1997 Markup by
06/05/1997 Reported by H. Rept. 105-121
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution03/05/1997 Referred to
04/30/1997 Hearings by
05/08/1997 Markup by
05/08/1997 Reported by
Senate Judiciary06/16/1997 Referred to
06/24/1998 Markup by
06/24/1998 Reported by
Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution, Federalism, and Property Rights06/03/1998 Referred to
06/17/1998 Markup by
06/17/1998 Reported by