Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/19/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/05/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/05/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/05/1997
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/11/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/19/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/05/1998