Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/20/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/15/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/15/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/15/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/23/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 04/23/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/23/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 04/30/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/30/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/30/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/13/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/20/1997
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 05/20/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 05/20/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/20/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/09/1997
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 01/28/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/01/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/01/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 04/01/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/01/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/01/1998