Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/20/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 03/20/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/20/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/21/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/21/1997
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/21/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/21/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/21/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 04/21/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 04/21/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/28/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/28/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 04/28/1997
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/28/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/28/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/30/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/30/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/30/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/30/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/30/1997
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/30/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/30/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/30/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/30/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/30/1997
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/30/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/30/1997
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 05/30/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/30/1997
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/30/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/30/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/30/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/30/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/30/1997
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/30/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/30/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/30/1997
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/30/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/30/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/03/1997
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/03/1997
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/03/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/03/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/03/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 09/03/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/03/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/03/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/03/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 09/03/1997
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/03/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/03/1997
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 09/03/1997
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/03/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/03/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 09/03/1997
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 09/03/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/03/1997
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 09/03/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 09/03/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 09/03/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 09/03/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 09/03/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/03/1997
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 09/03/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/03/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/03/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/03/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/03/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/03/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/03/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 11/07/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 11/07/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 11/07/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 11/07/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 11/07/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 11/07/1997
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 11/07/1997
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 11/07/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 11/13/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 02/25/1998
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 02/25/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/10/1998
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 04/01/1998
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/01/1998
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 06/23/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/14/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 07/14/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 08/04/1998