Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 03/20/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 04/17/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/17/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/17/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 04/17/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 04/17/1997
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 04/17/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 04/17/1997
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/17/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/17/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 04/23/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 04/23/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 04/23/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 04/23/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/13/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 05/13/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/13/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/13/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 05/13/1997
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 05/13/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/13/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/05/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/05/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 06/05/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/05/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/19/1997