Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 04/15/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 04/15/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 04/15/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 04/15/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 04/15/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/15/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 04/15/1997
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 04/15/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 04/15/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 04/15/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 04/15/1997
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 04/15/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 04/15/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 04/29/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 04/29/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/29/1997
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/21/1997
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 06/24/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/24/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 06/24/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/24/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 06/24/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/26/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/26/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 07/11/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 07/11/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 09/16/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 09/16/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 09/16/1997
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 10/23/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 11/08/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 11/13/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/04/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 02/04/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 03/24/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/24/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/24/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/24/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/24/1998
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/24/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 03/24/1998
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/21/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/21/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/21/1998
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 07/17/1998