Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 05/08/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 05/08/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 05/08/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 05/08/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 05/08/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 05/08/1997
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 05/08/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 05/08/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Thune, John R. [R-SD-At Large]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 06/04/1997
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 06/04/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/04/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 06/04/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/04/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/04/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/04/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 06/12/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/12/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 06/12/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 06/12/1997
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 06/12/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 06/12/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 07/08/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/08/1997
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 07/08/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/08/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 07/08/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/08/1997
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 07/08/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/08/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/28/1997
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 07/28/1997
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 10/22/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 10/22/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 10/22/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 10/22/1997
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 10/22/1997
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 10/22/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 10/22/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/13/1997
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 01/28/1998
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/28/1998
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 03/04/1998
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 03/24/1998
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/24/1998