There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Calling on the President to continue to support and fully participate in negotiations at the United Nations to conclude an international agreement to establish an international criminal court.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/30/1997Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
07/31/1997Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1567)
Action By: House of Representatives
07/30/1997Referred to the House Committee on International Relations.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/30/1997Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/30/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/03/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 09/03/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/03/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 09/03/1997
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/17/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 09/17/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/17/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 09/17/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/17/1997
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/17/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 09/17/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/17/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 09/17/1997
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 10/08/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/08/1997
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 10/08/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/21/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 10/21/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 10/21/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/12/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 11/13/1997
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 01/28/1998
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 01/28/1998
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/05/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/05/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/05/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 04/23/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 04/23/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/23/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/03/1998

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House International Relations07/30/1997 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.J.Res.89.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.J.Res.89. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/30/1997)

Calls for the President, acting through the permanent U.S. representatives to the United Nations (UN), to: (1) continue to support and fully participate in negotiations at the UN and especially in the preparatory committee to establish an international criminal court with jurisdiction over serious international crimes, including war crimes, genocide, and crimes against humanity; and (2) provide any assistance necessary to expedite the establishment of such a court.

Requires the President to report to the Congress on establishment of the court.