There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that the Departments of the Treasury, Defense, Commerce, and Labor should take steps to assist in increasing the competitiveness of the United States electronic interconnection industry.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/10/1997Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date All Actions
04/28/1997Referred to the Subcommittee on Postsecondary Education, Training and Life-Long Learning.
04/24/1997Referred to the Subcommittee on Telecommunications, Trade, and Consumer Protection, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Chairman.
04/21/1997Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Research and Development.
04/21/1997Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
04/15/1997Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
04/10/1997Referred to House Education and the Workforce
04/10/1997Referred to House National Security
04/10/1997Referred to House Commerce
04/10/1997Referred to House Ways and Means
04/10/1997Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Commerce, National Security, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/10/1997Introduced in House

Cosponsors (16)


Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Ways and Means04/10/1997 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade04/15/1997 Referred to
House Commerce04/10/1997 Referred to
House Commerce Subcommittee on Telecommunications, Trade, and Consumer Protection04/24/1997 Referred to
House National Security04/10/1997 Referred to
House National Security Subcommittee on Military Research and Development04/21/1997 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce04/10/1997 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Postsecondary Education, Training and Life-Long Learning04/28/1997 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.110.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.110. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/10/1997)

Calls for: (1) the Department of the Treasury, in order to assist in ensuring the financial soundness of the U.S. electronic interconnection industry, to develop an accelerated depreciation schedule to accurately reflect the depreciation of equipment used by the industry; (2) the Department of Defense to develop a dual-use technology program with the industry to upgrade the industry's technological capabilities; (3) the International Trade Administration of the Department of Commerce to develop a joint industry-Government program to expand the export of goods and services of such industry; (4) the Department of Labor to develop a joint program with the industry to upgrade the training and skill levels of industry workers; and (5) the Secretaries of the Treasury, Defense, Commerce, and Labor to report to the Congress on any actions taken within their jurisdictions to increase industry competitiveness.