Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/16/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 04/16/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 04/16/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/16/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 04/16/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/16/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/16/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/16/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 04/16/1997
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/16/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/16/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 04/16/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/16/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/16/1997
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 04/16/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 04/16/1997
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 04/16/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 04/16/1997
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 04/16/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22]* 04/16/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/16/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/16/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 05/01/1997
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/01/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 05/01/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/01/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/01/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/01/1997
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 05/01/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/01/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/01/1997
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/01/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/01/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 05/01/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 05/01/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/01/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/01/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/01/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/01/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 05/01/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/01/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/01/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/01/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/01/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/01/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/12/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/12/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/12/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/12/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 06/12/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/12/1997
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/12/1997
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/12/1997
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/12/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 06/12/1997
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/24/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 07/24/1997
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/31/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 07/31/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 09/05/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 09/05/1997
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/09/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/21/1998