There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that the Department of Education, States, and local education agencies should spend a greater percentage of Federal education tax dollars in our children's classrooms.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
10/29/1997Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 310 - 99 (Roll no. 538).
10/28/1997Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 105-349.
05/01/1997Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date All Actions
10/29/1997-2:17pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/29/1997-2:17pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 310 - 99 (Roll no. 538).
10/29/1997-2:08pmConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9640)
10/28/1997-1:01pmAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 5, rule I, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
10/28/1997-12:16pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
10/28/1997-12:15pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9567-9575)
10/28/1997-12:15pmMr. Goodling moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
10/28/1997Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 119.
10/28/1997Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 105-349.
06/25/1997Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 20 - 16.
06/25/1997Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/18/1997Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/12/1997Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote.
06/12/1997Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/22/1997Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Youth and Families.
05/01/1997Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
05/01/1997Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E818-819)
05/01/1997Introduced in House

Cosponsors (84)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3]* 05/01/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/20/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 05/20/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 05/20/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 05/20/1997
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 05/20/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/20/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/20/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 05/20/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/20/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/22/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/03/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 06/03/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/03/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/03/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 06/03/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/05/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/05/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/12/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 06/12/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 06/12/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 06/12/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/12/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 06/20/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 06/20/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/09/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 07/11/1997
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 07/16/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 07/16/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/21/1997
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 07/23/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/30/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/03/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 09/03/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 09/04/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 09/04/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 09/04/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/04/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 09/04/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 09/04/1997
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/04/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 09/08/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 09/09/1997
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 09/10/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 09/10/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 09/10/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 09/10/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 09/10/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 09/10/1997
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 09/10/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/10/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/17/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 09/18/1997
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 09/18/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 09/23/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 09/23/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 09/25/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 09/25/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/25/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 10/01/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 10/01/1997
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 10/07/1997
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 10/07/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 10/24/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 10/24/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 10/28/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 10/28/1997

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce05/01/1997 Referred to
06/25/1997 Markup by
10/28/1997 Reported by H. Rept. 105-349
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Youth and Families05/22/1997 Referred to
06/12/1997 Markup by
06/12/1997 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.Res.139.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.139. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (10/29/1997)

Urges the Congress, the Department of Education, States, and local educational agencies to: (1) determine the extent to which Federal elementary and secondary education program funds are currently reaching the classroom; (2) work together to remove barriers that currently prevent a greater percentage of such funds from reaching the classroom; and (3) work toward the goal of having at least 90 percent of the Department of Education elementary and secondary education program funds ultimately reach classrooms, when feasible and consistent with law.