Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3]* 05/01/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/20/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 05/20/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 05/20/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 05/20/1997
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 05/20/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/20/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/20/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 05/20/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/20/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/22/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/03/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 06/03/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/03/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/03/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 06/03/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/05/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/05/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/12/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 06/12/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 06/12/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 06/12/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/12/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 06/20/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 06/20/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/09/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 07/11/1997
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 07/16/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 07/16/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/21/1997
Rep. Thune, John R. [R-SD-At Large] 07/23/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/30/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/03/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 09/03/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 09/04/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 09/04/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 09/04/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/04/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 09/04/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 09/04/1997
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/04/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 09/08/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 09/09/1997
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 09/10/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 09/10/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 09/10/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 09/10/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 09/10/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 09/10/1997
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 09/10/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/10/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/17/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 09/18/1997
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 09/18/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 09/23/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 09/23/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 09/25/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 09/25/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/25/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 10/01/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 10/01/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 10/07/1997
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 10/07/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 10/24/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 10/24/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 10/28/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 10/28/1997