Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/14/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/14/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 05/14/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/14/1997
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/14/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 05/22/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 05/22/1997
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/22/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/22/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 05/22/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 05/22/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 05/22/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/22/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 05/22/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 05/22/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 05/22/1997
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 05/22/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/22/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/22/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/22/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 05/22/1997
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 05/22/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/22/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/22/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 05/22/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 05/22/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/22/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 05/22/1997
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 05/22/1997
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 05/22/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 05/22/1997
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 05/22/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 05/22/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 05/22/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 05/22/1997
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 05/22/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/22/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/22/1997
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 05/22/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/22/1997
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/22/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 05/22/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 05/22/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/17/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/17/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 06/17/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/26/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 06/26/1997
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 06/26/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 07/29/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/29/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 07/29/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 11/07/1997
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/07/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 11/07/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 11/07/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 11/07/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/07/1997
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 11/13/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 11/13/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 11/13/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 05/13/1998
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/13/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/13/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/13/1998
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/13/1998
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 05/13/1998
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 05/13/1998
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/13/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 05/13/1998
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/13/1998
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/13/1998
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/13/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/13/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/13/1998
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 06/11/1998
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 06/11/1998