Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/04/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/04/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/04/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/04/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/04/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/04/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 02/04/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/04/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 02/04/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 02/04/1997
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/04/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/04/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/04/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/04/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/04/1997
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/04/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/04/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 03/04/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 03/04/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/11/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/11/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/11/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 03/11/1997
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/11/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/14/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/10/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/09/1997