Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 05/15/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 05/15/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/03/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/03/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/03/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/03/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/03/1997
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/18/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/18/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 07/17/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/17/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 07/17/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 01/28/1998
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 03/12/1998
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 04/28/1998
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 10/13/1998