Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 10/24/1997
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/24/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 10/24/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 10/24/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/24/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 10/24/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 10/24/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/24/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/24/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/24/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 10/24/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 10/24/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 10/24/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 10/24/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 10/24/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 10/24/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 10/24/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 10/24/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/24/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/24/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 10/24/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 10/24/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 10/24/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 10/24/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 10/24/1997
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 10/24/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/24/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 10/24/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 10/24/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 10/24/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 10/24/1997
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 10/24/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/24/1997
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 10/24/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 10/24/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 10/24/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 10/24/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 10/24/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/24/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/24/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 10/24/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/24/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 10/24/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 10/24/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/24/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 10/24/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/24/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 10/24/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 10/24/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 10/24/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/24/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 10/24/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 10/24/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/24/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 10/24/1997
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7] 10/24/1997
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 10/24/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 10/24/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 10/24/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 10/24/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 10/24/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 10/24/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 10/24/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 10/24/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 10/24/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 10/24/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 10/24/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 10/24/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 10/24/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 10/24/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 10/24/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 10/24/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 10/24/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/24/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 10/24/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 10/24/1997
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/24/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 10/24/1997
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 10/24/1997
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 10/29/1997
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 10/29/1997
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/29/1997
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/29/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/29/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 10/29/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 10/29/1997
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 11/05/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 11/05/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 11/05/1997
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 11/05/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 11/05/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 11/07/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 11/07/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/07/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 11/07/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 11/07/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 11/07/1997
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 11/13/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 11/13/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 11/13/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/27/1998
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 01/27/1998