Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 09/23/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/23/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/23/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/23/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 10/07/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 11/13/1997
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 11/13/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 11/13/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/03/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 03/03/1998
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/03/1998
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 03/03/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/03/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 03/03/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/03/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/03/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 03/03/1998
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/03/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/03/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/03/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/03/1998
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/03/1998
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/03/1998
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 03/03/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 03/17/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/17/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/17/1998
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/17/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 03/17/1998
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 03/17/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/27/1998
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/27/1998
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/06/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 05/06/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/06/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 05/06/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 05/06/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/06/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 05/06/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 05/06/1998
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/06/1998
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/06/1998
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 05/06/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/06/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/06/1998
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/06/1998
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/06/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/06/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/06/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/06/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 05/06/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/03/1998
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/03/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/03/1998
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/03/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/03/1998
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 06/03/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 06/03/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/03/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/03/1998
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/03/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 06/03/1998
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/03/1998
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/18/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/18/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 07/16/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/16/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 08/07/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/16/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/16/1998