Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 02/04/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/04/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/04/1997
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/04/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/04/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 02/04/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 02/04/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/04/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/04/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 02/04/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 02/04/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/04/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/04/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/04/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/04/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/04/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 02/04/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/04/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 02/04/1997
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 02/04/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/11/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/11/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 02/11/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 02/11/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/11/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/11/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 02/25/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 02/25/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 02/25/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 02/25/1997
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 02/27/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/27/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/10/1997
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/10/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/20/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/20/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/21/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 04/09/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/09/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/09/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/09/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 04/09/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 04/09/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/09/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 04/09/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/24/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/24/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/24/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/24/1997
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/17/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 08/06/1998