Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 02/04/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/11/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 02/11/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 02/11/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 02/25/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/21/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/07/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/07/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 05/07/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/07/1997