Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 10/21/1997
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 10/21/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/23/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/23/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 10/23/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/23/1997
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 10/23/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 10/23/1997
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/23/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 10/23/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 10/23/1997
Rep. Thune, John R. [R-SD-At Large] 10/23/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 10/23/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 10/23/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 10/23/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 10/23/1997
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 10/23/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 10/23/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 10/23/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 10/23/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/23/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 10/23/1997
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 10/23/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/23/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 10/23/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 10/23/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 10/24/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 10/24/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 10/24/1997
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 10/24/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 10/24/1997
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 10/24/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/24/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 10/24/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/24/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 10/24/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 10/24/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 10/24/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 10/24/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 10/24/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 10/24/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 10/24/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 10/24/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 10/24/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 10/24/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/24/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 10/24/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 10/24/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 10/24/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 10/24/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 10/24/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 10/24/1997
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 10/24/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 10/24/1997
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/24/1997
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 10/24/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 10/24/1997
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 10/24/1997
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 10/24/1997
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 10/24/1997
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 10/24/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 10/24/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 10/24/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 10/24/1997
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 10/24/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 10/24/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 10/24/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/24/1997
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 10/24/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 10/24/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 10/24/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/24/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 10/24/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 10/24/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 10/24/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 10/24/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 10/24/1997
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 10/24/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 10/24/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 10/24/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 10/24/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 10/24/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 10/24/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 10/24/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 10/24/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 10/24/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 10/24/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 10/24/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 10/24/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 10/24/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 10/24/1997
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/24/1997
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 10/24/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/24/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 10/24/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 10/24/1997
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/24/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 10/24/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 10/24/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 10/24/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 10/24/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 10/24/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 10/24/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 10/24/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 10/24/1997
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 10/24/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 10/29/1997
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 10/29/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/29/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 10/29/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/29/1997
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 10/29/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 10/29/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 10/29/1997
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 10/29/1997
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 10/29/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 10/29/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 10/29/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/29/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 10/29/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 10/29/1997
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/29/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 10/29/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/29/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 10/30/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 10/30/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 10/31/1997
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 10/31/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 11/06/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 11/06/1997
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 11/07/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 11/08/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 11/12/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 11/12/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 11/12/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 11/12/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 11/12/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 11/12/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/12/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/12/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 11/12/1997
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 11/12/1997
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 11/13/1997
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 11/13/1997
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 11/13/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 11/13/1997
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 11/13/1997
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 11/13/1997
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 11/13/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 11/13/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 11/13/1997
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 11/13/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 11/13/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 01/28/1998
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/04/1998
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 02/04/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 02/05/1998
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/05/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 02/05/1998
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 02/05/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/04/1998
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/10/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 03/10/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/11/1998
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 03/11/1998