Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 10/23/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/24/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/24/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 10/24/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/24/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/24/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/24/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/24/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 10/24/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/24/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 10/24/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 10/24/1997
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/24/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/28/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 10/28/1997
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 10/28/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/28/1997
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/31/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/31/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/31/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/04/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/04/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 11/04/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/04/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 11/04/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 11/04/1997
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 11/04/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 11/04/1997
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 11/04/1997
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 11/05/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 11/05/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/05/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 11/05/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 11/05/1997
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 11/05/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 11/07/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 11/07/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 11/07/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/07/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/07/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/07/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/09/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 11/12/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/12/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 11/12/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 11/12/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/12/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 11/13/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 11/13/1997
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 11/13/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 11/13/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/13/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 02/11/1998
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 02/11/1998
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/11/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 02/11/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/11/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/12/1998
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 02/12/1998
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/12/1998
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 02/24/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/24/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/01/1998