Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 03/26/1998
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 03/26/1998
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 03/26/1998
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 03/26/1998
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 03/26/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 03/26/1998
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 03/26/1998
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 03/26/1998
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 03/26/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 03/26/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 03/26/1998
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 03/26/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/26/1998
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 03/26/1998
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 03/26/1998
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 03/26/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 03/26/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 03/26/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 03/26/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/26/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 03/26/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3]* 03/26/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 03/26/1998
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 03/30/1998
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/30/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 03/31/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 03/31/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/01/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/01/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/21/1998
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 04/21/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/21/1998
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/23/1998
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/04/1998
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 05/07/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 05/11/1998
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/13/1998
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/13/1998
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 05/22/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/22/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew