Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/10/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/10/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/10/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/10/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/10/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/10/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/10/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 02/10/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/27/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 02/27/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/27/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/27/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/27/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/27/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 02/27/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 02/27/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/12/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/12/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 03/12/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/12/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/12/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/12/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/12/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/12/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 03/12/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/12/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/21/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/21/1997
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/21/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/21/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 05/21/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 05/21/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/21/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 11/13/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 03/27/1998