Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/24/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/24/1998
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/24/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/24/1998
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 06/24/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/24/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/24/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/24/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 07/14/1998
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 07/14/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 07/14/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/14/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 07/14/1998
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 07/14/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/14/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/14/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 07/14/1998
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 07/14/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/14/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/14/1998
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 07/14/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/14/1998
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/14/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/15/1998
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/15/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 07/15/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 07/15/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/15/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/15/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/15/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/15/1998
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/17/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/17/1998
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/17/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 07/17/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/21/1998
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 07/21/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/21/1998
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/21/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 07/21/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 07/21/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 07/21/1998
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/21/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/21/1998
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/21/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/21/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/22/1998
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 07/22/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/22/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/22/1998
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 07/22/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/22/1998
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/22/1998
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/22/1998
Rep. Johnson, Jay W. [D-WI-8] 07/22/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 07/27/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/27/1998
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/27/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 07/31/1998
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/31/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/31/1998
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 08/07/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 08/07/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 08/07/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/11/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/11/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/11/1998
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/11/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 09/11/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 09/11/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/11/1998
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/11/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/11/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/11/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/11/1998
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/11/1998
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 09/11/1998
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/11/1998
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/18/1998
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/18/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/18/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/18/1998
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/23/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/23/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 09/23/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/23/1998
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/01/1998
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/01/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/01/1998
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 10/01/1998
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 10/08/1998