Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 06/18/1998
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/18/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/18/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/18/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 06/18/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/18/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 06/18/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 06/18/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/18/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 06/18/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/18/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 06/18/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 06/18/1998
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/18/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/18/1998
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/24/1998
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/24/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/21/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/21/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 08/06/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 08/06/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 09/10/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/10/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/10/1998
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/10/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 09/16/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/16/1998
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/24/1998
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/25/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/25/1998
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/05/1998
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/08/1998