Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/11/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 02/11/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 02/11/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/11/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/11/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 02/11/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/12/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/12/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/12/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 02/12/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/12/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 02/12/1997
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 02/13/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/13/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 02/13/1997
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 02/25/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 02/25/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 02/27/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/27/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 03/06/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/18/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/18/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/18/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/21/1997