Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 10/01/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 10/01/1998
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 10/01/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/02/1998
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/02/1998
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 10/02/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/02/1998
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 10/02/1998
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/05/1998
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/05/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 10/05/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 10/05/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 10/06/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/06/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 10/06/1998
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/07/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 10/07/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/07/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/07/1998