Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 10/01/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 10/01/1998
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 10/01/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 10/01/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 10/02/1998
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 10/02/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/02/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 10/02/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 10/02/1998
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 10/02/1998
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 10/02/1998
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 10/02/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 10/05/1998
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 10/06/1998
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 10/07/1998