Text: H.Res.611 — 105th Congress (1997-1998)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

  • TXT
  • PDF (PDF provides a complete and accurate display of this text.) Tip?

Shown Here:
Enrolled Bill

 
[Congressional Bills 105th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H. Res. 611 Enrolled Bill (ENR)]


 
       Articles of Impeachment Against William Jefferson Clinton

   (House Resolution 611, One Hundred Fifth Congress, Second Session)




                    CONGRESS OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,
                                  IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES,
                                                     December 19, 1998.


                               RESOLUTION

      Resolved, That William Jefferson Clinton, President of the United 
States, is impeached for high crimes and misdemeanors, and that the 
following articles of impeachment be exhibited to the United States 
Senate:
      Articles of impeachment exhibited by the House of Representatives 
of the United States of America in the name of itself and of the people 
of the United States of America, against William Jefferson Clinton, 
President of the United States of America, in maintenance and support 
of its impeachment against him for high crimes and misdemeanors.

                               ARTICLE I

      In his conduct while President of the United States, William 
Jefferson Clinton, in violation of his constitutional oath faithfully 
to execute the office of President of the United States and, to the 
best of his ability, preserve, protect, and defend the Constitution of 
the United States, and in violation of his constitutional duty to take 
care that the laws be faithfully executed, has willfully corrupted and 
manipulated the judicial process of the United States for his personal 
gain and exoneration, impeding the administration of justice, in that:
      On August 17, 1998, William Jefferson Clinton swore to tell the 
truth, the whole truth, and nothing but the truth before a Federal 
grand jury of the United States. Contrary to that oath, William 
Jefferson Clinton willfully provided perjurious, false and misleading 
testimony to the grand jury concerning one or more of the following: 
(1) the nature and details of his relationship with a subordinate 
Government employee; (2) prior perjurious, false and misleading 
testimony he gave in a Federal civil rights action brought against him; 
(3) prior false and misleading statements he allowed his attorney to 
make to a Federal judge in that civil rights action; and (4) his 
corrupt efforts to influence the testimony of witnesses and to impede 
the discovery of evidence in that civil rights action.
      In doing this, William Jefferson Clinton has undermined the 
integrity of his office, has brought disrepute on the Presidency, has 
betrayed his trust as President, and has acted in a manner subversive 
of the rule of law and justice, to the manifest injury of the people of 
the United States.
      Wherefore, William Jefferson Clinton, by such conduct, warrants 
impeachment and trial, and removal from office and disqualification to 
hold and enjoy any office of honor, trust, or profit under the United 
States.

                               ARTICLE II

      In his conduct while President of the United States, William 
Jefferson Clinton, in violation of his constitutional oath faithfully 
to execute the office of President of the United States and, to the 
best of his ability, preserve, protect, and defend the Constitution of 
the United States, and in violation of his constitutional duty to take 
care that the laws be faithfully executed, has prevented, obstructed, 
and impeded the administration of justice, and has to that end engaged 
personally, and through his subordinates and agents, in a course of 
conduct or scheme designed to delay, impede, cover up, and conceal the 
existence of evidence and testimony related to a Federal civil rights 
action brought against him in a duly instituted judicial proceeding.
      The means used to implement this course of conduct or scheme 
included one or more of the following acts:
        (1) On or about December 17, 1997, William Jefferson Clinton 
    corruptly encouraged a witness in a Federal civil rights action 
    brought against him to execute a sworn affidavit in that proceeding 
    that he knew to be perjurious, false and misleading.
        (2) On or about December 17, 1997, William Jefferson Clinton 
    corruptly encouraged a witness in a Federal civil rights action 
    brought against him to give perjurious, false and misleading 
    testimony if and when called to testify personally in that 
    proceeding.
        (3) On or about December 28, 1997, William Jefferson Clinton 
    corruptly engaged in, encouraged, or supported a scheme to conceal 
    evidence that had been subpoenaed in a Federal civil rights action 
    brought against him.
        (4) Beginning on or about December 7, 1997, and continuing 
    through and including January 14, 1998, William Jefferson Clinton 
    intensified and succeeded in an effort to secure job assistance to 
    a witness in a Federal civil rights action brought against him in 
    order to corruptly prevent the truthful testimony of that witness 
    in that proceeding at a time when the truthful testimony of that 
    witness would have been harmful to him.
        (5) On January 17, 1998, at his deposition in a Federal civil 
    rights action brought against him, William Jefferson Clinton 
    corruptly allowed his attorney to make false and misleading 
    statements to a Federal judge characterizing an affidavit, in order 
    to prevent questioning deemed relevant by the judge. Such false and 
    misleading statements were subsequently acknowledged by his 
    attorney in a communication to that judge.
        (6) On or about January 18 and January 20, 21, 1998, William 
    Jefferson Clinton related a false and misleading account of events 
    relevant to a Federal civil rights action brought against him to a 
    potential witness in that proceeding, in order to corruptly 
    influence the testimony of that witness.
        (7) On or about January 21, 23, and 26, 1998, William Jefferson 
    Clinton made false and misleading statements to potential witnesses 
    in a Federal grand jury proceeding in order to corruptly influence 
    the testimony of those witnesses. The false and misleading 
    statements made by William Jefferson Clinton were repeated by the 
    witnesses to the grand jury, causing the grand jury to receive 
    false and misleading information.
      In all of this, William Jefferson Clinton has undermined the 
integrity of his office, has brought disrepute on the Presidency, has 
betrayed his trust as President, and has acted in a manner subversive 
of the rule of law and justice, to the manifest injury of the people of 
the United States.
      Wherefore, William Jefferson Clinton, by such conduct, warrants 
impeachment and trial, and removal from office and disqualification to 
hold and enjoy any office of honor, trust, or profit under the United 
States.






                       Speaker of the House of Representatives.

      Attest:






                                                               Clerk.