Summary: H.Res.91 — 105th Congress (1997-1998)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (03/21/1997)

Makes necessary amounts available for continuing expenses of standing and select committees of the House of Representatives (other than the Committee on Government Reform and Oversight) for the period of April 1, 1997, through May 2, 1997, on the same terms and conditions as amounts were available to such committees for the period of January 3, 1997, through March 31, 1997.

Makes a specified amount available for expenses of the House Committee on Government Reform and Oversight, including the expenses of staff salaries, for the 105th Congress. Sets forth first and second session limitations.

Establishes a reserve fund for unanticipated expenses of committees for the 105th Congress to be paid to them pursuant to allocations approved by the Committee on House Oversight.

Grants such Committee the authority to make adjustments in the amount made available for the Committee on Government Reform and Oversight if necessary to comply with a presidential sequestration order or to conform to any reduction in appropriations with respect to the other standing and select committees.

Provides that any net increase in the aggregate amount of committees expenses for the 105th Congress over the aggregate amount of funds appropriated for such expenses for the 104th Congress shall be offset by reductions in expenses for other legislative branch activities.