Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 03/13/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 03/13/1997
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 03/13/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 03/13/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 03/13/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 03/18/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 03/18/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/18/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 03/18/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 03/18/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/18/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/18/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/19/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 03/21/1997
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/08/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 04/08/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/16/1997
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 07/20/1998