Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC]* 07/10/1997
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 07/10/1997
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 07/10/1997
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 07/10/1997
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 07/10/1997
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO]* 07/10/1997
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA]* 07/10/1997
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 07/10/1997
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 07/10/1997
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 07/10/1997
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 07/22/1997
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 07/24/1997
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 07/29/1997
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 03/26/1998
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 05/06/1998