There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Veterans Employment Opportunities Act of 1998

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Veterans Employment Opportunities Act of 1998

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Veterans Employment Opportunities Act of 1998

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans Employment Opportunities Act of 1997

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 5, United States Code, to provide that consideration may not be denied to preference eligibles applying for certain positions in the competitive service, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
10/31/1998Became Public Law No: 105-339. (TXT | PDF)
10/31/1998Signed by President.
10/20/1998Presented to President.
10/08/1998Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
10/05/1998Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/21/1998Committee on Veterans Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Specter with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 105-340.
07/16/1997Introduced in Senate

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
10/31/1998Became Public Law No: 105-339. (TXT | PDF)
10/31/1998Signed by President.
10/20/1998SenatePresented to President.
10/08/1998-11:24pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/08/1998-11:24pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
10/08/1998-11:05pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
10/08/1998-11:05pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10185-10190)
10/08/1998-11:05pmHouseMr. Mica moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
10/06/1998-5:10pmHouseHeld at the desk.
10/06/1998SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/06/1998-9:01amHouseReceived in the House.
10/05/1998SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/05/1998SenateS.Amdt.3738 Amendment SP 3738 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
10/05/1998SenateS.Amdt.3738 Proposed by Senator Grams for Senator Specter. To improve the bill.
10/05/1998SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S11506-11509)
09/21/1998SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 592.
09/21/1998SenateCommittee on Veterans Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Specter with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 105-340.
07/28/1998SenateCommittee on Veterans Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
03/24/1998SenateCommittee on Veterans Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 105-949.
07/16/1997SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans Affairs.
07/16/1997SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S7603-7604)

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Veterans' Affairs07/16/1997 Referred to
03/24/1998 Hearings by
07/28/1998 Markup by
09/21/1998 Reported by S. Rept. 105-340

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1021. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (10/05/1998)

Veterans Employment Opportunities Act of 1998 - Amends Federal employment provisions to prohibit veterans' preference eligibles or veterans who have been separated from military service under honorable conditions after three years or more of active service from being denied the opportunity to compete for vacant positions for which the agency making the announcement will accept applications from individuals outside its own workforce under merit promotion procedures. Requires such announcements to indicate that such preference eligibles or veterans are so eligible. Directs the Office of Personnel Management to establish an appointing authority to appoint such preference eligibles and veterans.

Authorizes a preference eligible who alleges that an agency has violated his or her employment rights to file a complaint with the Secretary of Labor, requiring such complaint to be filed within 60 days of the alleged violation.

Requires the Secretary to investigate each such complaint and to resolve complaints found to be legitimate by ensuring agency compliance with the appropriate preference eligible statute or regulation. Provides that, if the Secretary is unable to resolve a complaint within 60 days, then the complainant may elect to appeal the alleged violation to the Merit Systems Protection Board (Board). Authorizes a preference eligible, in lieu of a Board proceeding, to elect to terminate further administrative proceedings and file an action with the appropriate U.S. district court.

Provides that, if the Board or a court determines that an agency has violated a preference eligible right, it shall order the agency to comply with the appropriate statute or regulation and award compensation for wages or benefits lost due to such violation.

Applies preference eligible requirements to: (1) the General Accounting Office; and (2) positions within the staff of the President, Vice President, and Domestic Policy Staff and Office of Administration. Provides exceptions for (2), above, with respect to positions which are confidential or policy-making positions and positions for which political affiliation or philosophy is an important qualification when, in either case, the individual selected is expected to vacate the position at or before the end of that President's term(s) of office.

Extends the veterans' preference to appointments to the legislative branch, with specified exclusions.

Requires the Judicial Conference of the United States to prescribe procedures for: (1) veterans' preference in the consideration of applicants for employment within the judicial branch; and (2) redress for alleged violations of such requirements. Provides exclusions. Requires the Conference to provide specified congressional committees with a copy of such procedures.

Amends the Department of Transportation and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 1996 to apply veterans' preference requirements to reductions in force in the Federal Aviation Administration.

Prohibits any employee authorized to take personnel actions from knowingly taking, or failing to take, any personnel action if such taking or failure would violate a preference eligible requirement.

Includes within a veterans' employment preference under Federal procurement contracts of $25,000 (currently $10,000) or more any veteran who served on active duty during a war or in a campaign or expedition for which a campaign badge has been authorized. Prohibits an agency from obligating or expending appropriated funds to enter into such a contract with a contractor who did not comply with certain reporting requirements regarding the use of such preference for contracts awarded in a previous fiscal year. Requires the Secretary to make available in a database a list of contractors that have complied with such reporting requirements. Requires the inclusion within such report of information concerning the maximum and minimum number of employees of such contractor during the period covered.