There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

National Discovery Trails Act of 1998

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

National Discovery Trails Act of 1998

Short Titles as Introduced

National Discovery Trails Act of 1997

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill entitled the "National Discovery Trails Act of 1997."


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/17/1998Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8534-8535)
04/29/1998Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 105-177.
07/25/1997Introduced in Senate

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
07/24/1998HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Resources
07/20/1998HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
07/20/1998SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/20/1998-2:03pmHouseReceived in the House.
07/17/1998SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8534-8535)
04/29/1998SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 349.
04/29/1998SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 105-177.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
03/11/1998SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
02/11/1998SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 105-475.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
07/25/1997SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
07/25/1997SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S8153)

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources07/25/1997 Referred to
02/11/1998 Hearings by
03/11/1998 Markup by
04/29/1998 Reported by S. Rept. 105-177
House Resources07/20/1998 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands07/24/1998 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.1069.


Subjects (32)

  • California
  • Colorado
  • Congressional reporting requirements
  • Delaware
  • District of Columbia
  • Illinois
  • Indiana
  • Iowa
  • Kansas
  • Kentucky
  • Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
  • Maryland
  • Metropolitan areas
  • Missouri
  • National seashores
  • Nebraska
  • Nevada
  • Nonprofit organizations
  • Ohio
  • Planning
  • State parks
  • Trails
  • Urban affairs
  • Utah
  • Volunteer workers in recreation
  • Walking
  • West Virginia

Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1069. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (07/17/1998)

National Discovery Trails Act of 1998 - Amends the National Trails System Act to provide for the establishment, as components of the National Trails System, of national discovery trails which shall be extended, continuous interstate trails located so as to provide for outdoor recreation and travel and to connect representative examples of America's trails and communities. Permits such trails to be designated on nonfederal lands, with an owner's consent.

Prohibits a trail from being considered feasible and desirable for designation as a national discovery trail unless it: (1) links one or more areas within the boundaries of a metropolitan area and joins with other trails, tying the National Trails System to significant recreation and resources areas; (2) is supported by a competent trailwide nonprofit organization and has extensive local and trailwide support by the public, user groups, and affected State and local governments; and (3) extends and passes through more than one State and, at a minimum, is a continuous, walkable route.

Requires the appropriate Secretary for each national discovery trail to administer the trail in cooperation with a competent trailwide volunteer-based organization.

Designates as a national discovery trail the 6,000-mile American Discovery Trail which shall extend from Cape Henlopen State Park in Delaware to Point Reyes National Seashore in California, traveling northern and southern routes from Cincinnati, Ohio, to Denver, Colorado. Requires the administering Federal agency, within three complete fiscal years after designation of a national discovery trail, to provide for a comprehensive plan for the protection, management, development, and use of the Federal portions of the trail and provide technical assistance to States, local units of government, and private landowners, as requested, for nonfederal portions of the trail.