Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 07/25/1997
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/24/1997
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 09/24/1997
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 09/24/1997
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 09/24/1997
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 02/02/1998
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 03/09/1998
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/09/1998
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 03/09/1998
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 03/20/1998
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/23/1998
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 04/02/1998
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/23/1998
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/04/1998
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 05/04/1998