Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 01/21/1997
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH]* 01/21/1997
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 01/21/1997
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 01/21/1997
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 01/21/1997
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL]* 01/21/1997
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 01/21/1997
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 01/21/1997
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/21/1997
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 01/21/1997
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 01/30/1997
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 02/06/1997
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 02/07/1997
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 04/14/1997