Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 09/03/1997
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN] 09/03/1997
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 09/08/1997
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 09/09/1997
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 09/09/1997
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 09/09/1997
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 09/24/1997
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 09/25/1997
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 09/29/1997
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 09/29/1997
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 10/07/1997
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 10/21/1997
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 10/30/1997